Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/26/2021 at 22:02:07 (UTC).

Paul Banh vs. Robbie Deann Weathers AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Paul Banh filed an Other lawsuit against Robbie Deann Weathers AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Sanders, Kenneth D. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7426

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Sanders, Kenneth D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Banh, Paul

Defendant

Weathers, Robbie Deann

Kennedale, TX 76060

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Israel L. Suster

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Eviction Hearing; (11:50 AM) (Judicial Officer Sanders, Kenneth D) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed; 925 5701 4545

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketNotice: Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit and proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: EXECUTED 4/19/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDefendant Contacted Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketZoom Hearing Scheduled: 925 5701 4545 ZOOM EMAILED TO PLFT ATTY AND MAILED TO DEFN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • DocketEVICTION: Weathers, Robbie Deann: Served: 04/19/2021; Returned: 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • DocketAlias Citation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned Unexecuted - Bad Address for Party: UNSERVED CLERK LISTED INCORRECT CITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEVICTION: Weathers, Robbie Deann: Returned Unserved 04/13/2021; Returned: 04/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketUpdated Party Information: PHONE NUMBER FOR DEFN PROVIDED BY PLTF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2021-02874: Banh, Paul: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Banh, Paul; Total Financial Assessment: 121.00; Total Payments and Credits: 121.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 121.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: MISSING NOTICE TO VACATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less