Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/10/2021 at 10:36:17 (UTC).

Patrick O'Connor & Associates, L.P. vs. Seven Landmark, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Patrick O'Connor Associates, L P filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Seven Landmark, LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5187

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick O'Connor & Associates, L.P.

Defendants

Seven Landmark, LLC

511 N. Akard Ste. 301

Dallas, TX 75201

B/S REGISTERED AGENT - WESLEY J. BAILEY

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tonya Monique Felix

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (9:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketTo Be Set for Trial: (1:00 PM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Answer Due; (8:30 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEmail Consent by Defendant: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed: BY PRO SE DEFN IN PERSON. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE EMAILED. SET FOR TRIAL. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DEFN COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. DEFN - SEVEN LANDMARK, LLC SERVED IN PERSON ON 3/15/2021 @ 10:36 AM AT 511 N AKARD ST STE 301, DALLAS, TX 75201-6615 BY PPS. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketEmailed: PETITION, EXHIBITS, AND CITATIONS TO PLTF ATTY FOR SERVICE. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Seven Landmark, LLC: Served: 03/15/2021; Returned: 03/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: AND EMAILED TO PLTF ATTY FOR SERVICE. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2021-01098: Patrick O'Connor & Associates, L.P.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Patrick O'Connor & Associates, L.P.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Petition W/ EXHIBIT A & B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Patarick O'Connor & Associaes LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tonya Monique Felix