This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/12/2020 at 12:59:10 (UTC).

PATRICK O'CONNOR & ASSOCIATES, L.P. VS. MONTAGE DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 PATRICK O'CONNOR ASSOCIATES, L P filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MONTAGE DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Satisfied.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4060

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Satisfied

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRICK O'CONNOR & ASSOCIATES, L.P.

Defendants

C/O DERICK MURWAY

MONTAGE DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Catherine D. Hoffman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketRelease of Judgment Entered: APPROVED; COPIES MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JLM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketJudgment Satisfied Per Plaintiff: PRESENTED TO JDG. JLM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued and Mailed: TO PLTF. JLM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP3-2019-05315: PATRICK O'CONNOR & ASSOCIATES, L.P.: (5.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Requested: FEES PAID IN FULL. JLM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Brandt, William P. "Bill") ; Judgment of $666.77; Awarded To: PATRICK O'CONNOR & ASSOCIATES, L.P.; Awarded Against: MONTAGE DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketBond for Appeal Set: 1333.54 + 20.00 BOND FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketAppeal Information Picked up by Defendant: JLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketOrder Entered on Case: AT TIME OF NON-JURY TRIAL PLTF & DEFN APPEARED; JUDGMENT FOR PLTF IN THE AMOUNT OF $667.77 + CC @ 5.00% INT. COPIES MAILED TO ALL PARITES. JLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (10:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerBrandt, William P. "Bill")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Business Records Affidavit Filed: VIA MAIL; W/PROPOSED JUDGMENT. JLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketTrial letter mailed: NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 9-11-19 AT 10:30AM SOUTHLAKE. COPIES MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketAnswer Filed: BY DEFN; ANS & AFFIRM DEFENSES; JLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON DEFN IN PERSON ON 3-21-19 AT 7:26PM; JLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketCITATION: MONTAGE DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC.: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketComments: CITATION ISSUED AND MAILED TO PLTF'S ATTY FOR SERVICE. KD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • FinancialMail Payment: Receipt # JP3-2019-00959: PATRICK O'CONNOR & ASSOCIATES, L.P.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff PATRICK O'CONNOR & ASSOCIATES, L.P.; Total Financial Assessment: 51.00; Total Payments and Credits: 51.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): SOUTHLAKE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONTAGE DEVELOPMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Patarick O'Connor & Associaes LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Catharine D Hoffman