This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/29/2022 at 12:24:49 (UTC).

Patrick Leclerc vs. Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/08/2022 Patrick Leclerc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Samsung Electronics America, Inc. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6066

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leclerc, Patrick

Euless, TX 76039

Defendants

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

1999 Bryan St., Ste. 900

Dallas, TX 75201

SERVE REGISTERED AGENT - CT CORPORATION SYSTEM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DENNIS SIAW-LATTEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketHearing: (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Brandt, William P. "Bill") : 12/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (9:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: To Be Set for Hearing; (2:00 PM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing: (RESET) PRE-TRIAL HEARING ON 12-5-22 @ 11:30AM IN SOUTHLAKE. JLM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff Filed Notice of Vacation Schedule: BY PLTF VIA EMAIL. ON FAMILY VACATION DECEMBER 10-20, 2022. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing: PRE-TRIAL HEARING ON 12-12-22 @ 9:00AM IN SOUTHLAKE. JLM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (9:30 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed: Defendant's Original Answer. General Denial. Set for Hearing. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketLetter Issued: AND MAILED TO DEFN COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff Contacted Court: BY PHONE TO CHECK STATUS ON CASE; ADVISED HIM THE COURT HAS NO RETURN OF SRVC AS OF TODAY YET; PLTF STATED HE WILL CONTACT THE DALLAS CONSTABLE TO CHECK STATUS ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: W/ AFFIDAVIT. DEFN SERVED - REGISTERED AGENT - CT CORPORATION SYSTEM IN PERSON B/S GEORGE MARTINEZ, SOP INTAKE ASSOCIATE ON 8-10-2022 @ 1:50 PM AT 1999 BRYAN ST STE 900, DALLAS, TX 75201 BY DALLAS COUNTY CONSTABLE, PCT 1. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2022-03180: Leclerc, Patrick: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Leclerc, Patrick; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEmailed: PETITION AND CITATION TO PLTF FOR OUT OF COUNTY SERVICE. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketCITATION: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.: Served: 08/10/2022; Returned: 08/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: AND EMAILED TO PLTF FOR OUT OF COUNTY SERVICE. MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Guide and File - Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SERVE REGISTERED AGENT AT: CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIAW-LATTEY, DENNIS