Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/15/2021 at 05:39:47 (UTC).

Pason Systems USA Corp. vs Strategy Operating, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 Pason Systems USA Corp filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Strategy Operating, LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rymell, Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********15-2

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rymell, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pason Systems USA Corp.

Defendants

B/S Its Registered Agent, Ryan Roberts

Midland, TX 79701

Strategy Operating, LLC

210 North Main Street

Midland, TX 79701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. Roth

Defendant Attorney

Robert Brian Shields

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Motion for Summary Judgment; (10:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerRymell, Jennifer) ; Per Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing / Trial Index #11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Index #10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketLetter Index #9: cover letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketLetter Index #8: Copy of letter to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index #5: Answer-General Denial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-163237: Pason Systems USA Corp.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Pason Systems USA Corp.; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCitation: Hold for Roth Attorney p/u; Strategy Operating, LLC: Served: 08/10/2020; Returned: 08/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketLetter Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Strategy Operating, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Pason Systems USA Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. Roth