This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/14/2017 at 14:10:08 (UTC).

PALO ALTO APARTMENTS vs. RAYMOND GUZMAN AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 02/25/2016 PALO ALTO APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RAYMOND GUZMAN AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3318

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALO ALTO APARTMENTS

3808 Post Oak Blvd

Euless, TX 76040

Defendant

GUZMAN, RAYMOND

Fort Worth, TX 76040

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2016
  • Dispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • CANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Motion To Dismiss Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Request For Alternate Service Filed and Approved: CITN REISSUED TO CONST PCT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • EVICTION: GUZMAN, RAYMOND: Served: 02/26/2016; Returned: 02/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP2-2016-00811: SARAH DEBOER/PALTO ALTO: (116.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff PALO ALTO APARTMENTS; Total Financial Assessment: 116.00; Total Payments and Credits: 116.00; Balance Due as of 02/14/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PALO ALTO APARTMENTS is a litigant