This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/14/2017 at 19:24:06 (UTC).

PALO ALTO APARTMENTS vs. DANIEL KAPINGA AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 04/19/2016 PALO ALTO APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DANIEL KAPINGA AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3924

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALO ALTO APARTMENTS

3808 Post Oak Blvd.

Euless, TX 76040

Defendant

KAPINGA, DANIEL

Ft. Worth, TX 76039

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2016
  • Dispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Judgment of $957.67; Awarded To: PALO ALTO APARTMENTS; Awarded Against: DANIEL KAPINGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Vacate Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • During the Pendency of Appeal, the Interm Rent Due Is

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial: (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Curnutt, Mary Tom) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • EVICTION: KAPINGA, DANIEL: Served: 04/21/2016; Returned: 04/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP2-2016-01567: SARAH DEBOER: (116.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff PALO ALTO APARTMENTS; Total Financial Assessment: 116.00; Total Payments and Credits: 116.00; Balance Due as of 02/14/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PALO ALTO APARTMENTS is a litigant