Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/12/2021 at 08:48:33 (UTC).

Paige Stetson vs Sixt Rent A Car, LLC,

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 Paige Stetson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sixt Rent A Car, LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rymell, Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********34-2

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rymell, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stetson, Paige

Defendants

a Delaware Limited Liability Company

5444 Westheimer #1000

Houston, TX 77056

B/S Its Reg Agent, Corporate Creations Network, Inc.,

5444 Westheimer #1000

Houston, TX 77056

Sixt Rent A Car, LLC,

5444 Westheimer #1000

Houston, TX 77056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Geoffrey E Schorr

Defendant Attorney

Jonathan Edward Cheatham

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketJury Trial: (7:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerRymell, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketAgreed Scheduling Order Index #6: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Signed Agreed Scheduling Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-164243: Sixt Rent A Car, LLC,: (40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant Sixt Rent A Car, LLC,; Total Financial Assessment: 40.00; Total Payments and Credits: 40.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketJury Fee Payment Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer W/Req Disclosure Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #3: Return of Service - Sixt Rent A Car

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-163425: Stetson, Paige: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Stetson, Paige; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCitation: Mailed 7/29; Sixt Rent A Car, LLC,: Served: 08/05/2020; Returned: 08/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2: Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIXT RENT-A-CAR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ,a Delware Limited Liability Company is a litigant