Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/11/2021 at 13:37:53 (UTC).

OXFORD AT LAKE WORTH vs. HAYNNON WEATHERS AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 OXFORD AT LAKE WORTH filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HAYNNON WEATHERS AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0308

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OXFORD AT LAKE WORTH

1501 Westpark View Drive

Fort Worth, TX 76108

Defendant

WEATHERS, HAYNNON

Fort Worth, TX 76108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Defendant; (Judicial Officer: Gregory, Christopher) ; Judgment; Awarded To: HAYNNON WEATHERS; Awarded Against: OXFORD AT LAKE WORTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketHearing: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerGregory, Christopher) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketEVICTION: WEATHERS, HAYNNON: Served: 03/10/2021; Returned: 03/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP4-2021-1112: OXFORD AT LAKE WORTH: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff OXFORD AT LAKE WORTH; Total Financial Assessment: 121.00; Total Payments and Credits: 121.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 121.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEmail Consent by Plaintiff: LAKEWORTH@OXFORDMANAGEMENT.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCares Act Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Vacate Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OXFORD AT LAKE WORTH is a litigant