Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/04/2021 at 08:05:51 (UTC).

Overseas Military Sales Corporation- OMSC, LTD vs Marcus Demetris Johnson

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Overseas Military Sales Corporation- OMSC, LTD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Marcus Demetris Johnson. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rymell, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********31-2

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rymell, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Overseas Military Sales Corporation

175 Crossways Park Drive West

Woodbury, NY 11797

-OMSC, Ltd, A Foreign Corporation

175 Crossways Park Drive West

Woodbury, NY 11797

Defendant

Johnson, Marcus Demetris

Fort Worth, TX 76123

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J. Heath Coffman

Manuel Ramos

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution: mailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-170021: Overseas Military Sales Corporation: (5.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 13: Post-Judgment request for writ of execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Index # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-168437: Overseas Military Sales Corporation: (5.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Abstract of Judgment w/Copy Index # 11: Mail To Atty Per Request 01/13/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketRule 239a Notice of Default Judgment Index # 10: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Rymell, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 5: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106 Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Rule 106 signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketMotion Rule 106 w/Diligent Attempt Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-164799: Overseas Military Sales Corporation: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Overseas Military Sales Corporation; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCitation: Mailed to Attorney Office 09/10/2020; Johnson, Marcus Demetris: Served: 11/12/2020; Returned: 11/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OVERSEAS MILITARY SALES CORPORATION - OMSC, LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Manuel Ramos

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Heath Coffman