This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/27/2022 at 04:30:18 (UTC).

Onemain Financial Group LLC vs. Vic D Skinner

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 Onemain Financial Group LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Vic D Skinner. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1904

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Onemain Financial Group LLC

2601 Nw Expressway Suite 205E

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

Defendant

Skinner, Vic D

Fort Worth, TX 76131

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Crystal Griffin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On: TDH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service//EFILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEmailed: CIT AND PETN TO PPS//TDH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM: EMAILED ABC LEGAL//TDH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2022-03510: Onemain Financial Group LLC: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Onemain Financial Group LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: MorganAssociatesTX@abclegal.com//TDH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Crystal Griffin