Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/09/2021 at 04:31:56 (UTC).

Onemain Financial Group LLC. vs. Rusty L Alcorn

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Onemain Financial Group LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rusty L Alcorn. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8055

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Onemain Financial Group LLC.

2601 Nw Expressway Suite 205E

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

Defendant

Alcorn, Rusty L

Watauga, TX 76148

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Sullivan Vernon

Defendant Attorney

Emery C. Shannon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed: EFILED// BY DEFN'S ATTY// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service//EFILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAIL ABC LEGAL//MB; Alcorn, Rusty L: Served: 04/17/2021; Returned: 04/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2021-01975: Onemain Financial Group LLC.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Onemain Financial Group LLC.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed: EFILED//W PROOF//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: MorganAssociatesTX@abclegal.com//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emery C Shannon