This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/26/2022 at 04:33:24 (UTC).

Onemain Financial Group, Llc vs. James D Henson

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 Onemain Financial Group, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against James D Henson. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1644

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Onemain Financial Group, Llc

2601 Nw Expressway Suite 205E

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

Defendant

Henson, James D

Fort Worth, TX 76244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dean Emerson Mackert

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On: FV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service/EFILED/ HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM: EMAIL TO ABCLEGAL//FV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketEmailed: CITN AND PETN TO PPS//FV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2022-02734: Onemain Financial Group, Llc: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Onemain Financial Group, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: MorganAssociatesTX@abclegal.com//FV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dean Emerson Mackert