This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/21/2023 at 04:01:06 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC vs. FELIPE GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FELIPE GOMEZ. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Sanders, Kenneth D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0293

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Sanders, Kenneth D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Defendant

GOMEZ, FELIPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dean Emerson Mackert

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketMailed: DJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketEmailed: DJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Sanders, Kenneth D) ; Judgment of $9,546.93; Awarded To: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC; Awarded Against: FELIPE GOMEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketCase Summary Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketZoom Hearing Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketRequest For Zoom Hearing Filed: 2ND REQUEST- LOCAL COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketNo Further Action Taken By The Court: PROCEED TO 5.16.23 NJT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Sanders, Kenneth D) : Result: Judgment: ZOOM ID 824 9892 3950

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketComments: REPLIED BACK AND STATED THAT PLTF ATTY WILL NEED TO SUBMIT A SEPERATE REQUEST FOR ZOOM AS WELL AS STATE A REASON WHY SHE IS REQUESTING IT OR IT MAY BE DENIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketRequest For Zoom Hearing Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed: BANKRUPTCY POSSIBLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketCITATION: GOMEZ, FELIPE: Served: 03/18/2023; Returned: 03/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED PER REQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2023-02394: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 55.00; Total Payments and Credits: 55.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: to MorganAssociatesTX@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less