This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/14/2021 at 10:44:15 (UTC).

Onemain Financial Group, Llc vs. Demeshia Diggs

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 Onemain Financial Group, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Demeshia Diggs. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6170

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Onemain Financial Group, Llc

2601 Nw Expressway Suite 205E

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

Defendant

Diggs, Demeshia

Keller, TX 76244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Sullivan Vernon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketPre-Trial Mediation: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Brandt, William P. "Bill")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDefendant Contacted Court: RECEIVED NOTICE OF HEARING, STATED SHE ALREADY CAME INTO AN AGREEMTN WITH PLTF'S ATTY, INFORMED AS OF TODAY WE HAVE NOT RECEIVED ANYTHING FROM PLTF'S ATTY. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Pre-Trial Mediation Hearing: EMAILED/MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. MEDIATION SET FOR 10/14/21 AT 1:00PM. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed: BY PRO SE DEFN IN PERSON. PHONE NUMBER AND EMAIL ADDRESS ADDED. CASE TO BE SET FOR MEDIATION/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DEFN COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE.AMW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: BY PPS SERVED ON 7/24/21 AT 10:20 BY 501 AT 4636 VISTA MEADOWS DR KELLER TXC 76244.AMW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL FOR SERVICE. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: BY PPS. PRESENTED TO JUDGE. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2021-03100: Onemain Financial Group, Llc: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Onemain Financial Group, Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Diggs, Demeshia: Served: 07/24/2021; Returned: 07/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL FOR SERVICE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): PLAINTIFF'S LAW FIRM: MORGAN & ASSOCIATES MM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S. Vernon