This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/09/2023 at 16:04:51 (UTC).

Onemain Financial Group, LLC, As Servicer For (ASF) Wilmington Trust, N.A., As Issuer Loan Trustee For Onemain Financial Issuance Trust 2020-2 vs. Jason M Borish

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Onemain Financial Group, LLC, As Servicer For ASF Wilmington Trust, N A , As Issuer Loan Trustee For Onemain Financial Issuance Trust 2020-2 filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jason M Borish. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8894

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Onemain Financial Group, LLC, As Servicer For (ASF) Wilmington Trust, N.A., As Issuer Loan Trustee For Onemain Financial Issuance Trust 2020-2

2601 Nw Expressway Suite 205E

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

Defendant

Borish, Jason M

Saginaw, TX 76179-3409

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dean Emerson Mackert

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketPre-Trial Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) : **HEAR MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketProposed Order: JUDGMENT ENTRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed: Military Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketMotion for Summary Disposition Filed: Motion for Summary Disposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Hearing: PRE-TRIAL | EMAILED TO PLTF'S ATTY AND MAILED TO DEFN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: e-mld to ABC at MorganAssociatesTX@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2023-217: Onemain Financial Group, Llc, As Servicer For (???asf???) Wilmington Trust, N.a., As Issuer Loan Trustee For Onemain Financial Issuance Trust 2020-2: (38.50)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Onemain Financial Group, LLC, As Servicer For (ASF) Wilmington Trust, N.A., As Issuer Loan Trustee For Onemain Financial Issuance Trust 2020-2; Total Financial Assessment: 59.50; Total Payments and Credits: 59.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 59.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: MorganAssociatesTX@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less