This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/05/2023 at 10:09:24 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, AS SERVICER FOR ("ASF") WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1 vs. William A Ogorman

Case Summary

On 03/07/2023 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, AS SERVICER FOR ASF WILMINGTON TRUST, N A , AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1 filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against William A Ogorman. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8441

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, AS SERVICER FOR ("ASF") WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1

Defendant

Ogorman, William A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dean Emerson Mackert

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Continuance Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Judgment of $17,154.47; Awarded To: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, AS SERVICER FOR ("ASF") WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1; Awarded Against: William Ogorman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: ATTESTATION AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketEmailed: RETAIN TO PLTF ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketOrder to Retain Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketMotion to Retain Filed: Plaintiff's Motion to Retain and Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO MORGANASSOCIATESTX@ABCLEGAL.COM; Ogorman, William A: Served: 05/01/2023; Returned: 05/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2023-02395: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, AS SERVICER FOR ("ASF") WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, AS SERVICER FOR ("ASF") WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketMilitary Status Proof Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less