This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/04/2020 at 12:19:28 (UTC).

OneFunder Inc d/b/a Onefunder vs Jose Luis Mata JR d/b/a Joe Mata Construction and Jose L Mata Jr.

Case Summary

On 06/20/2019 OneFunder Inc d/b/a Onefunder filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Jose Luis Mata JR d/b/a Joe Mata Construction and Jose L Mata Jr. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********41-1

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

90 Broad Street

New York, NY 75240

OneFunder Inc

16Th Floor

New York, NY 75240

d/b/a Onefunder

16Th Floor

New York, NY 75240

Defendants

Mata, Jose Luis, JR

Laredo, TX 78043

d/b/a Joe Mata Construction

3410 E Fiesta Loop

Laredo, TX 78043

Mata Jr., Jose L

Laredo, TX 78045

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Brendon Palmer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketLetter Index #15: Re: Oath of Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketOath Index #14: of Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketOrder Compelling Answer Interrogatories Index #13: Production of Documents,the Issuance of a Turnover Order, and the Appointment of a Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index #12: electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Sign paper order appoint receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel: (9:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerPierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketLetter Index #11: to Deft RE MTC Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketLetter Index #10: RE: Motion to Compel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Index #9: and Receivership

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution: mailed to aty

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketRequest for Abstract of Judgment & Writ of Execution Index #7: Ltr to Clerk.Issue.Abstract.Writ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketLetter Index #6: Clerk.Notice.Filed.Foreign.Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketNotice Index #5: of Filing Foreign Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-148925: OneFunder Inc: (254.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff OneFunder Inc; Total Financial Assessment: 264.00; Total Payments and Credits: 264.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketDispositions: Final Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketFinal Judgment Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketLetter Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2: Affidavit on Filing Foreign Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEFUNDER INC DBA ONEFUNDER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Brendon Palmer