This case was last updated from Tarrant County Court on 01/22/2023 at 17:28:31 (UTC).

Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC vs Home Depot Product Authority, LLC and John Doe

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Home Depot Product Authority, LLC and John Doe. This case was filed in Tarrant County Court, County Court at Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********61-1

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC

Defendants

Doe, John

Home Depot Product Authority, LLC

b/s registered agent Corporation Service Company dba CSC- Lawy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jourdan Jackson Dukes

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Dismissal With Prejudice; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal With Prejudice Index # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 5: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Index # 4: with Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-180072: Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC: (221.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 358.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCitation: eserved to Attorney; Home Depot Product Authority, LLC: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less