This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/16/2017 at 15:17:45 (UTC).

NORTH GREENBRIAR APTS vs. DEBORAH WILLIAMS AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 07/24/2015 NORTH GREENBRIAR APTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DEBORAH WILLIAMS AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 5 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DE LEON, SERGIO L. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3804

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DE LEON, SERGIO L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTH GREENBRIAR APTS

5201 James Ave

Fort Worth, TX 76115

Defendant

WILLIAMS, DEBORAH

Fort Worth, TX 76115

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TREVIN R. WARE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2015
  • Dispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Dispositions: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution; (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice on Plaintiff's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Order to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal Granted(OCA Reactivated)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Hearing: (3:30 PM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • Comments: CLK LOCATED THE FAXED MOTION TO DISMISS THE PLTF SENT IN PRIOR TO THE COURT DATE/CASE HAS ALREADY BEEN DISMISSED IN COURT/UPON REVIEWING JUDGE DE LEON SET UP A SPECIAL HEARING ON (08/17/15 @ 3:30PM) TO DISCUSS THE ISSUED WITH ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Defendant's Attorney Filed Letter of Representation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Comments: DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER TO A COMPLAINT FOR FORCIBLE ENTRY AND DETAINER FILED DEFT'S ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Order of Dismissal/Want of Prosecution W/O Prejudice Entered: W/ATTY FEES $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Motion To Dismiss Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Hearing: (9:30 AM) () : Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Motion To Dismiss Filed by Plaintiff: VIA FAX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • EVICTION: 073115 ALIAS CITN RETD/EXECUTED 073115/BY ALTERNATE SERVICE/ATTACHED/MAILED/SET FOR TRAIL (081215 @ 9:30AM); WILLIAMS, DEBORAH: Served: 07/31/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Request For Alternate Service Filed and Approved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • EVICTION: CITN RETD/REQUEST FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE; WILLIAMS, DEBORAH: Returned Unserved 07/28/2015; Returned: 07/28/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Generate Label

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP5-2015-01743: ANA MESINAS: (116.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff NORTH GREENBRIAR APTS; Total Financial Assessment: 116.00; Total Payments and Credits: 116.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ware, Trevin R