This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/16/2017 at 04:44:16 (UTC).

Norris Boone vs. CHRYSTAL BARRY AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 07/29/2016 Norris Boone filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHRYSTAL BARRY AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6778

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boone, Norris

Fort Worth, TX 76119

Defendant

BARRY, CHRYSTAL

Forest Hill, TX 76119

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2016
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Woodard, Lisa R) ; Judgment of $3,250.00; Awarded To: Norris Boone; Awarded Against: CHRYSTAL BARRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Writ of Possession Returned: EXECUTED-RETURNED TO PROPER OWNER..RDK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION: BARRY, CHRYSTAL: Served: 08/25/2016; Returned: 08/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Writ of Possession Requested: BY PLTF * KEJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Abstract of Judgment Requested: BY PLTF * KEJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • During the Pendency of Appeal, the Interm Rent Due Is: 650.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Bond for Appeal Set: 1400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Evict - Default Judgment for Possession, Past Due Rent, & CC: FOR $3250.00BR+CC..RDK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Default Notice Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Hearing: (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodard, Lisa R) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2016
  • EVICTION: BARRY, CHRYSTAL: Served: 08/03/2016; Returned: 08/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Request For Alternate Service Filed and Approved: BTW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • EVICTION: BARRY, CHRYSTAL: Returned Unserved 08/02/2016; Returned: 08/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2016-02976: Boone, Norris: (155.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 155.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2016-02867: Boone, Norris: (5.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2016-02663: Boone, Norris: (116.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Boone, Norris; Total Financial Assessment: 276.00; Total Payments and Credits: 276.00; Balance Due as of 02/15/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    Read MoreRead Less