This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/17/2022 at 08:51:26 (UTC).

NextGear Capital, Inc. vs Henry Lewis Reece, JR, DeShaundra Danielle Branch

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 NextGear Capital, Inc filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Henry Lewis Reece, JR, DeShaundra Danielle Branch. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********36-1

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NextGear Capital, Inc.

420 Throckmorton Street, Suite 1210

Fort Worth, TX 76102

c/o Alan B. Padfield

Defendants

Branch, DeShaundra Danielle

735 Dulles Ave.

Stafford, TX 77477

Reece, Henry Lewis, JR

Stafford, TX 77477

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kelsey N. Linendoll

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Index # 10: padfield & stout box

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Index # 8: padfield & stout box

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-178166: NextGear Capital, Inc.: (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Abstract of Judgment w/Copy Index # 7: Request AJ (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-177098: NextGear Capital, Inc.: (254.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 264.00; Total Payments and Credits: 264.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Final Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketFinal Judgment Index # 9: as to Deshaundra Danielle Branch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 6: Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketFinal Judgment Index # 4: Exemplified judgment as to Henry Lewis Reece, Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNotice Index # 3: of Filing Foreign Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2: Affidavit of Filing Foreign Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nextgear Capital, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelsey N. Linendoll