This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/15/2022 at 12:15:26 (UTC).

NextGear Capital, Inc. vs Bank of America, N.A.

Case Summary

On 07/14/2022 NextGear Capital, Inc filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Bank of America, N A. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court at Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********11-3

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NextGear Capital, Inc.

Defendants

Bank of America, N.A.

1999 Bryan St., Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

B/S Registered Agent, CT Corporation System

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

1999 Bryan St, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Serve Reg. Agent. CT Corporation System

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kelsey N. Linendoll

Defendant Attorneys

Evan A. Moeller

Truman E Spring

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketSupplemental Answer Index # 17: Garnishee's Supplemental Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketAmended Original Answer Index # 16: Garnishee's First Amended Answer to Writ of Garnishment and Request for Award of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 15: to Writ of Garnishment and Request for Award of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 14: Re: Status of Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketBankruptcy Notice of Dismissal Index # 12: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy Index # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 10: - Writ of Garnishment (Bank of America, N.A.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 9: -Writ of Garnishment (JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Garnishment Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Index # 5: Amended Declaration for Writ of Garnishment after Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketAmended Original Petition: Amended Application for Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-184009: NextGear Capital, Inc.: (236.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 389.00; Total Payments and Credits: 389.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 373.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment: hold writ for Padfield & Stout; Bank of America, N.A.: Returned Unserved 07/21/2022; Returned: 07/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nextgear Capital, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelsey N. Linendoll