Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/22/2021 at 08:03:32 (UTC).

National Funding, Inc. vs JB Holmes Construction, LLC., Joe Holmes

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 National Funding, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JB Holmes Construction, LLC , Joe Holmes. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********86-1

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

National Funding, Inc.

9820 Towne Centre Dr.

San Diego, CA 92121

Defendants

Holmes, Joe

Lubbock, TX 79423

JB Holmes Construction, LLC.

8213 Elkridge Ave

Lubbock, TX 79423

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. Roth

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketMotion for Receiver: (9:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerPierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketLetter of Confirmation of Hearing Index #5: set for 4/30/2021 @ 9:30am (Motion for Receivership)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMotion: for Receivership Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-169955: National Funding, Inc.: (254.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff National Funding, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 254.00; Total Payments and Credits: 254.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Final Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketFinal Judgment Index #4: Exemplified Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNotice Index #3: Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2: Affidavit, Foreign Judgment with Proof of Mailing to Judgment Debtors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. Roth