This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/21/2020 at 07:08:59 (UTC).

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2003-1 A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST vs. JASON W. NORRIS

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2003-1 A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JASON W NORRIS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0163

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2003-1 A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST

Defendant

NORRIS, JASON W.

Arlington, TX 76012

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketEmailed: DISMISSAL TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit With Prejudice Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialMail Payment: Receipt # JP2-2019-06139: ABC LEGAL SERVICES, LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2003-1 A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCITATION: NORRIS, JASON W.: Served: 12/13/2019; Returned: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less