Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/09/2017 at 19:34:18 (UTC).

Mylease.com vs Infinity County Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/08/2016 Mylease com filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Infinity County Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********95-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mylease.com

Defendants

b/s C. T. Corp System, registered agent

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Infinity County Mutual Insurance Company

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David L. Pritchard

Defendant Attorney

W EDWARD CARLTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2017
  • Defendant's Original Answer Doc ID# 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Citation: mailed to atty; Infinity County Mutual Insurance Company: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Paper Returned Doc ID# 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Doc ID# 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2016
  • Citation: mailed to atty; Infinity County Mutual Insurance Company: Returned Unserved 12/20/2016; Returned: 12/20/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID# 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID# 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-117592: Mylease.com: (15.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-117174: Mylease.com: (264.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Mylease.com; Total Financial Assessment: 279.00; Total Payments and Credits: 279.00; Balance Due as of 02/09/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 264.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Infinity County Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David L. Pritchard