This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/01/2020 at 08:44:20 (UTC).

Morsco Supply, LLC dba Morrison Supply Co. vs James Bailey Plumbing, LLC, James Bailey

Case Summary

On 08/09/2019 Morsco Supply, LLC dba Morrison Supply Co filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against James Bailey Plumbing, LLC, James Bailey. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hrabal, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********28-3

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hrabal, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Morsco Supply, LLC dba Morrison Supply Co.

Defendants

b/s William R. Nix, Registered Agent

Vision Bank NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig A. Bernstein

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAM R NIX

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Doc ID#12: emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Doc ID#9: emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Dismissal With Prejudice; (Judicial Officer: Hrabal, Mike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal With Prejudice Doc ID#11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Non Suit; (Judicial Officer: Hrabal, Mike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketOrder for Non-Suit Doc ID#10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketAgreed Motion to Dismiss Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Non-Suit Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketPaper Returned Doc ID#6: Return of Service of Notice on Judgment Debtor James Bailey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketPaper Returned Doc ID#5: Return of Service of Notice on Judgment Debtor James Bailey Plumbing, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Garnishment Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketNotice: Notice/Precept mailed to Attorney; James Bailey Plumbing, LLC: Served: 08/21/2019; Returned: 08/28/2019; Bailey, James: Served: 08/21/2019; Returned: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment: Writ mailed to Attorney; Vision Bank NA: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-150885: Morsco Supply, LLC dba Morrison Supply Co.: (244.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Morsco Supply, LLC dba Morrison Supply Co.; Total Financial Assessment: 244.00; Total Payments and Credits: 244.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 244.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketLetter Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Morrison Supply Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Vision Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William R Nix