This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/16/2017 at 05:23:25 (UTC).

MORRISON SUPPLY COMPANY LLC VS. THOMAS KEMP FORD AKA TOM FORD

Case Summary

On 11/13/2014 MORRISON SUPPLY COMPANY LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THOMAS KEMP FORD AKA TOM FORD. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 5 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DE LEON, SERGIO L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4307

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DE LEON, SERGIO L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORRISON SUPPLY COMPANY LLC

Defendant

THOMAS KEMP FORD AKA TOM FORD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L) ; Judgment of $3,029.65; Awarded To: MORRISON SUPPLY COMPANY LLC; Awarded Against: THOMAS KEMP FORD AKA TOM FORD; Comment: COPY OF JUDGMENT MLD TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued and Mailed: TO PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Requested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketDefault Notice Mailed: (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketProve Up Hearings: (1:30 PM) () : Result: Judgment: 05-06-15: SETTING LTRS ALONG W/NOTICE RE: INTERPRETERS MLD TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address Filed: W/REQ TO SET CASE FOR TRAIL OR DEFAULT & SCRA, FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • DocketComments: ALIAS CITN RETD/EXECUTED 03-27-15/ATTACHED & MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • DocketCITATION: ALIAS CITN W/ALT SVC ATTACHED ISSD & MLD TO PROF CIIVL PROCESS @ PO BOX 342467, AUSTIN TX 78734-0042; THOMAS KEMP FORD AKA TOM FORD: Served: 03/27/2015; Returned: 04/15/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: ALONG W/MOTION ON SAME, FILED BY PPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • DocketCITATION: CITN ISSD & MLD TO PLTF WHO WILL FWD TO PPS FOR SVC;; THOMAS KEMP FORD AKA TOM FORD: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • DocketGenerate Label

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketMail Payment: Receipt # JP5-2015-01511: MORRISON SUPPLY COMPANY LLC: (5.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • DocketMail Payment: Receipt # JP5-2014-01916: MORRISON SUPPLY COMPANY LLC: (41.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff MORRISON SUPPLY COMPANY LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 41.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Morrison Supply Company, LLC is a litigant