This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/15/2022 at 15:19:31 (UTC).

Momo's Construction LLC vs Kaana Development LLP, Montage Development Company LLC,and Huntington Beach Properties LLC

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 Momo's Construction LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kaana Development LLP, Montage Development Company LLC,and Huntington Beach Properties LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********27-3

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Momo's Construction LLC

a limited liability company

Defendants

Huntington Beach Properties LLC

1601 Elm Street Suite 4360

Dallas, TX 75201

b/s registered agent, Cogency Global Inc.

or wherever it may be found

a domestic limited liability company

Kaana Development LLP

151 Players Circle Suite 200

Southlake, TX 76092

b/s one of its general partners, Deborah Murway or Huma Azim

a domestic limited liability partnership

Montage Development Company LLC

829 Siena Drive

Southlake, TX 76092

b/s registered agent, Derick Murway

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd Goldberg

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 8: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Non Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketOrder for Non-Suit Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Non-Suit Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 5: Return of Service on Kaana Development LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: Return of Service on Montage Development Company LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 3: Return of Service on Huntington Beach Properties, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-171983: Momo's Construction LLC: (266.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Momo's Construction LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 266.00; Total Payments and Credits: 266.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 266.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCitation: Mailed to Attorney 5/4/2021; Kaana Development LLP: Served: 06/01/2021; Returned: 06/02/2021; Montage Development Company LLC: Served: 06/01/2021; Returned: 06/02/2021; Huntington Beach Properties LLC: Served: 05/14/2021; Returned: 05/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONTAGE DEVELOPMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ,a Domestic Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATIO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd Goldberg