Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/17/2018 at 08:02:35 (UTC).

Mira Monte Apts vs Cynthia Johnson and All Occupants

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 Mira Monte Apts filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Cynthia Johnson and All Occupants. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********16-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mira Monte Apts

5816 Boca Raton Blvd.

Fort Worth, TX 76112

Defendants

and All Occupants

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Johnson, Cynthia

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rachel G. Cole

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • Dispositions: Final Judgment After non Jury Trial; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Writ of Possession: placed in constable basket 2-6-18; Johnson, Cynthia: Served: 02/09/2018; Returned: 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Request for Writ of Possession Doc ID#12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Civil Docket Doc ID#11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Judgment - Final After Non Jury Doc ID#10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial: (1:30 PM) (Judicial OfficerPierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Order Setting Trial Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Letter Requesting Setting for Trial Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Letter to Pauper Pro Bono Option Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Letter Notifying Parties of Case Filing Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • JP Transcript of Judgment Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Affidavit of Inability to Pay Doc ID#4: Approved December 7, 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • JP Judgment Doc ID#3: Signed December 1, 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • JP Sworn Complaint for Eviction Doc ID#2:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • OCA Appeal Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-129969: Mira Monte Apts: (155.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Mira Monte Apts; Total Financial Assessment: 155.00; Total Payments and Credits: 155.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 155.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Inability to Pay Court Cost: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Financial Information: Defendant Johnson, Cynthia; Total Financial Assessment: 0.00; Total Payments and Credits: 0.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIRA MONTE APTS is a litigant