This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/16/2022 at 11:05:16 (UTC).

Mintaka Financial, LLC vs Amegy Bank National Association and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 Mintaka Financial, LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Amegy Bank National Association and Wells Fargo Bank, N A. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court at Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********81-1

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mintaka Financial, LLC

Defendants

Amegy Bank National Association

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

b/s Registered Agent, Corporation Service Company

dba CSC - Lawyers Incorporating Service Company

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701-3218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandon Gibbons

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey Dale Stewart

Brent W Martinelli

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketRule 306a Notice of Final DJ or Appealable Order Index # 11: (Electronically Served to all Attorney's and/or Mailed to All Parties)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don) ; Party(; Amegy Bank National Association; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketJudgment - Agreed Index # 10: of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 8: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 7: - Amegy Bank National Association Garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 6: and Request for Award of Costs (Wells Fargo Bank N.A.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketNotice Index # 5: of Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-184329: Mintaka Financial, LLC: (244.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Mintaka Financial, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 381.00; Total Payments and Credits: 381.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 381.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment: Hold for Padfield and Stout; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.: Served: 07/28/2022; Returned: 08/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment: Hold for Padfield and Stout; Amegy Bank National Association: Served: 07/28/2022; Returned: 08/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 3: Application for Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Index # 2: Affidavit For Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSC - Lawyers Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where MINTAKA FINANCIAL LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where AMEGY BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant