Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/15/2018 at 08:26:02 (UTC).

MIKE BROWN ENTERPRISES, INC.D/B/A AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL ALUMINUM vs BLACKSMITH TRAILERS, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 MIKE BROWN ENTERPRISES, INC D/B/A AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL ALUMINUM filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BLACKSMITH TRAILERS, LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********70-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

D/B/A AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL ALUMINUM

MIKE BROWN ENTERPRISES, INC.

Defendants

BLACKSMITH TRAILERS, LLC

404 W. York Street

Bryson, TX 76427

b/s John Hayhurst, registered agent

Bryson, TX 76427

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher J. Jameson, JR

Defendant Attorney

Rick K. Disney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2018
  • Civil Docket Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Defendant's Original Answer Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Citation: citn mld to aty; BLACKSMITH TRAILERS, LLC: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Letter Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-128750: MIKE BROWN ENTERPRISES, INC.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff MIKE BROWN ENTERPRISES, INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rick K. Disney