This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/15/2017 at 17:11:41 (UTC).

MIGUEL RODRIGUEZ vs. MELISSA GONZALEZ AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 01/02/2014 MIGUEL RODRIGUEZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MELISSA GONZALEZ AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 5 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DE LEON, SERGIO L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2077

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DE LEON, SERGIO L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ, MIGUEL

Defendant

GONZALES, MELISSA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2014
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L) ; Judgment of $490.00; Awarded To: MIGUEL RODRIGUEZ; Awarded Against: MELISSA GONZALES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • DocketBond for Appeal Set: (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L ) : AT $1000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • DocketDuring the Pendency of Appeal, the Interm Rent Due Is: (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L ) : $600

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • DocketDefault Notice Mailed: (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L ) : TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • DocketEvict - Default Judgment for Possession, Past Due Rent, & CC: (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L ) : $490 PAST DUE RENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • DocketHearing: (9:30 AM) () : Result: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • DocketEVICTION: 010714 ALIAS CITN RETD/EXECUTED 010614/BY ALTERNATE SERVICE/ATTACHED/MAILED/SET FOR TRAIL (011714 @ 9:30AM); GONZALES, MELISSA: Served: 01/06/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketEVICTION: GONZALEZ, MILISSA: Returned Unserved 01/03/2014; Returned: 01/03/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketGenerate Label

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP5-2014-00004: RODRIGUEZ, MIGUEL: (116.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff RODRIGUEZ, MIGUEL; Total Financial Assessment: 116.00; Total Payments and Credits: 116.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less