Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/07/2017 at 04:20:53 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs. RICARDO ROMERO

Case Summary

On 06/21/2012 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against RICARDO ROMERO. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4040

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

8875 Aero Drive

San Diego, CA 92123

Defendant

ROMERO, RICARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNETTA LANG

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2012
  • Dispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Judgment of $4,026.39; Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: RICARDO ROMERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued and Mailed: MLD TO FULTON FRIEDMAN & GULLACE ROCHESTER, NY 14614.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • Abstract of Judgment Requested: HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • CANCELED: Pre-Trial Mediation; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • Plaintiff Filed: AGREED JUDGMENT//GRANTED//PTM CANCEL//MLD COPY TO BOTH PARTIES.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • Plaintiff Contacted Court: TO VERIFY THAT AGREED JUDGMENT HAD BEEN REC'D BY THE COURT**INFORMATION VERIFIED. HWG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Letter Issued: PTM SET FOR 10/19/12 AT 8:30AM//MLD NOTICE TO BOTH PARTIES.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Answer Filed: BY DEFN.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • Answer Due On: 7/23/12; DISC DUE 8/26/12.HH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • Comments: CITN ISSUED TO ABC LEGAL//ET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • CITATION: ROMERO, RICARDO: Served: 07/07/2012; Returned: 07/10/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • Mail Payment: Receipt # JP1-2013-03489: FULTON FRIEDMAN & GULLACE LLP: (5.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • Transaction Assessment: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP1-2012-02456: FULTON FRIEDMAN & GULLACE LLP: (31.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 36.00; Total Payments and Credits: 36.00; Balance Due as of 03/06/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 31.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lang, Johnetta