Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/01/2017 at 17:10:44 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. RANDY WESTER

Case Summary

On 08/19/2013 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against RANDY WESTER. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Casey, Russell B. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************2545

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Casey, Russell B

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

WESTER, RANDY

Euless, TX 76040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRISTY GABRIELOVA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2014
  • Dispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Casey, Russell B.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • Comments: FILE IN CONTAINER ID# 14-18 AT WAREHOUSE. CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • CANCELED: DWOP Hearing; (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Casey, Russell B.) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice on Plaintiff's Motion: JUDGE APPROVED; MAILED COPIES OF ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE TO PLTF'S ATTY AND DEFN /JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • Motion To Dismiss Filed by Plaintiff: W/OUT PREJUDICE BY PLTF'S ATTY (SIGNED BY BRIAN STALEY-ATTY W/ SAME FIRM); REC'D W/ CERT OF SERVICE AND ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE; PRESENTED TO JUDGE /JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Hearing Letter Mailed: DWOP HEARING SET FOR 03/28/14 AT 1030AM. MAILED NOTICE TO PLTF ATTY. CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Comments: NO ACTIVITY IN 90 DAYS, DEFN NOT SERVED. PLACED FILE IN DWOP BIN. CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • Citation Returned Unexecuted - Bad Address for Party: 1212 MONTERREY BLVD EULESS TX 76040 CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • Comments: BRODY WITH PCP PICKED UP PAPERWORK. CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • Comments: CITN ISSUED AND PLACED IN PCP FOLDER FOR PICKUP CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • CITATION: WESTER, RANDY: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • Mail Payment: Receipt # JP3-2013-03424: PROFESSIONAL CIVIL PROCESS: (31.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 31.00; Total Payments and Credits: 31.00; Balance Due as of 03/01/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 31.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristy Gabrielova