Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/03/2017 at 03:26:10 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs. NAUSHAD REZA

Case Summary

On 08/05/2013 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against NAUSHAD REZA. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Matt. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************3069

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Matt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

2365 Northside Drive Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant

REZA, NAUSHAD

Arlington, TX 76002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATHARINE M BANKS

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL W WESTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2014
  • Dispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • CANCELED: Pre-Trial Hearing; (8:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Hayes, Matt) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • Order of Non-Suit With Prejudice Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • Motion for Non-Suit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Order Denying Motion for Continuance Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Motion For Continuance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • CANCELED: Pre-Trial Hearing; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hayes, Matt) ; Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Order Granting Motion for Continuance Entered: FINAL CONTINUANCE 90 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Motion For Continuance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • CANCELED: Pre-Trial Hearing; (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hayes, Matt) ; Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • Order Granting Motion for Continuance Entered: 90 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • Agreed Motion for Continuance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • Process Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • CITATION: PCP; REZA, NAUSHAD: Served: 08/28/2013; Returned: 09/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • Mail Payment: Receipt # JP7-2013-05205: PROFESSIONAL CIVIL PROCESS: (31.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 31.00; Total Payments and Credits: 31.00; Balance Due as of 03/02/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 31.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WESTON , MICHAEL W