This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/15/2017 at 06:48:26 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs. LORRI HINSON

Case Summary

On 12/14/2015 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LORRI HINSON. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Matt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************3207

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Matt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HINSON, LORRI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kristy Gabrielova

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2016
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt) ; Judgment of $3,032.46; Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: LORRI HINSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Granted: FOR PLTF $3032.46 PLUS CC & INT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • DocketCertificate of Last Known Address Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketOrder to Retain Granted: 60 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketMotion to Retain Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • DocketCITATION: PCP; HINSON, LORRI: Served: 12/26/2015; Returned: 12/31/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP7-2015-07338: PROFESSIONAL CIVIL PROCESS: (41.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 41.00; Total Payments and Credits: 41.00; Balance Due as of 02/15/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 41.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristy Gabrielova