Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/02/2017 at 15:52:08 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs. JERRY CANTRELL

Case Summary

On 11/20/2012 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against JERRY CANTRELL. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Matt. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Satisfied.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************2159

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Satisfied

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Matt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

8875 Aero Drive

San Diego, CA 92123

Defendant

CANTRELL, JERRY

Arlington, TX 76001

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Johnetta Lang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2013
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt) ; Judgment of $2,531.97; Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: JERRY CANTRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • Release of Judgment Filed and Entered: RECVD VIA MAIL. FILE MARK COPY MLD TO PLTF ATTY. LFC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • Default Notice Mailed: (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • Prove Up Hearings: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hayes, Matt) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • Certificate of Last Known Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • Motion Filed: FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • Process Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • Answer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • CITATION: CANTRELL, JERRY: Served: 12/10/2012; Returned: 12/12/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP7-2012-07558: FULTON FRIEDMAN & GULLACE LLP: (31.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 31.00; Total Payments and Credits: 31.00; Balance Due as of 03/02/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 31.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lang, Johnetta