This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/16/2017 at 03:47:43 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs. EMILY HAWKINS

Case Summary

On 10/03/2014 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EMILY HAWKINS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 5 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DE LEON, SERGIO L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0334

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DE LEON, SERGIO L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HAWKINS, EMILY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATHARINE BANKS ALLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L) ; Judgment of $2,927.12; Awarded To: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Awarded Against: EMILY HAWKINS; Comment: COPY OF JUDGMENT MLD TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketDefault Notice Mailed: (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (9:30 AM) () : Result: Judgment: 03-17-15: SETTING LTRS ALONG W/NOTICE RE: INTERPRETERS MLD TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: AFFIDAVIT OF TRACY INGLES RE: TO DAMAGES & BUS RECS, FILED BY PLTF'S ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • DocketAnswer Filed: (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L ) : BY DEFT PRO SE; CLK TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL W/IN 90 DAYS PER AGREEMENT OF BOTH PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • DocketProve Up Hearings: (10:30 AM) () : Result: Set for Trial: 02-19-15: RESET LTRS ALONG W/NOTICE RE: INTERPRETERS MLD TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • DocketCANCELED: Prove Up Hearings; (2:00 PM) () ; Other; 01-22-15: SETTING LTRS ALONG W/NOTICE RE: INTERPRETERS MLD TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed: W/CERT OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS & SCRA, FILED BY PLTF'S ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2014
  • DocketComments: CITN RETD/EXECUTED 11-01-14/IN PERSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • DocketCITATION: CITN ISSD & MLD TO PROFESSIONAL CIVIL PROCESS A MEMBER OF THE AXZAS NETWORK @ PO BOX 342467, AUSTIN TX 78734-9815; HAWKINS, EMILY: Served: 11/01/2014; Returned: 11/11/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • DocketGenerate Label

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • DocketMail Payment: Receipt # JP5-2014-01659: PROF CIVIL PROCESS: (41.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 41.00; Total Payments and Credits: 41.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 41.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allen, Katharine Banks