Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/01/2021 at 06:37:56 (UTC).

Midland Funding Llc vs. Cesar Menchaca

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 Midland Funding Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Cesar Menchaca. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6130

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Menchaca, Cesar

North Richland Hills, TX 76180

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alex Anshul Munjal

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered: Order Granting Notice of Non-Suit//EFILED// COPY MLD TO PLTF ATTY// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit//W/O PREJ// EFILED// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCover Letter Filed: Cover Letter// EFILED// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF ATTY//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketOption Letter Mailed: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Non-Service Return// EFILED// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketEmailed: CTN TO PPS// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO PPS// NO; Menchaca, Cesar: Returned Unserved 01/25/2021; Returned: 01/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2020-05221: Midland Funding Llc: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Midland Funding Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex Anshul Munjal