This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/19/2021 at 19:29:34 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs. ANAIS PIERCE

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANAIS PIERCE. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5342

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

PIERCE, ANAIS

Fort Worth, TX 76133

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katharine Banks Allen

Defendant Attorney

Jerry J. Jarzombek

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Charbonnet, Jason M) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Charbonnet, Jason M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal Without Prejudice on Plaintiff's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss: Motion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion for Leave/Request for Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketProposed Order: Order Granting Defendant's Preliminary Motion Regarding Discovery and Evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketMotion Filed: Defendant's Motion Regarding Discovery and Evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Affidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCITATION: PIERCE, ANAIS: Served: 07/19/2021; Returned: 07/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEmailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2021-04774: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allen, Katharine Banks