Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/27/2017 at 21:53:08 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. ADISA ALAJBEGOVIC

Case Summary

On 08/20/2012 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against ADISA ALAJBEGOVIC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Casey, Russell B. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1149

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Casey, Russell B

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ALAJBEGOVIC, ADISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRISTY GABRIELOVA

Defendant Attorney

Whitney E. Abbott

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2013
  • Dispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Casey, Russell B.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • CANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (10:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Casey, Russell B.) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • Comments: FILE IN CONTAINER ID#13-112 AT WAREHOUSE. CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • Order of Dismissal With Prejudice on Plaintiff's Motion: MAILED COPY TO ALL PARTIES. CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • Motion for Non-Suit Filed: BY PLTF ATTY W/PREJUDICE. CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • Trial letter mailed: TO ALL PARTIES. NON JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/15/13 AT 9:30AM. HMR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • CANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Casey, Russell B.) ; Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • Order Granting Motion for Continuance Entered: PLACED FILE BACK IN TRIAL BIN. CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • Agreed Motion for Continuance Filed: SUBMITTED VIA FAX BY PLTF ATTY. PLTF ATTY SIGNED AND DEFN ATTY SIGNED. STATES PARTIES HAVE A FULL AND FINAL SETTLEMENT AND COURT TO EXPECT DISMISSAL. CANCELLED TRIAL. CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • Notice of Filing of Business Records Affidavit Filed: PLACED IN CASE FILE. HMR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • Comments: WHEN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL, ATTY ADDED IN ON CASE FROM ANSWER PREVIOUSLY FILED./BDM(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • Trial letter mailed: TO ALL PARTIES AND/OR ATTORNEYS./BDM(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed: BY PLTF ATTY. UPDATED INFO. CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Citation Returned: SERVED ON 08/30/12 CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • Answer Filed: DEF'S ORIGINAL ANSWER REC'D; GENERAL DENIAL.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED. SET FOR TRIAL. HMR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • Comments: CITATION ISSUED AND MAILED TO PCP FOR SERVICE CCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • CITATION: ALAJBEGOVIC, ADISA: Served: 08/30/2012; Returned: 09/24/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Mail Payment: Receipt # JP3-2012-03496: PROFESSIONAL CIVIL PROCESS: (31.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 31.00; Total Payments and Credits: 31.00; Balance Due as of 02/27/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 31.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Whitney Abbott