This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/08/2023 at 11:02:31 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. vs. ZACHARY ABELE

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ZACHARY ABELE. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9831

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

ABELE, ZACHARY

Keller, TX 76248-3124

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katharine Banks Allen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Brandt, William P. "Bill")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered: SIGNED BY JUDGE. SENT TO BOTH PARTIES. MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: BY PLTF'S ATTY VIA EFILE. PRESENTED TO JUDGE. MM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCITATION: ABELE, ZACHARY: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO PCP FOR SERVICE. HM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2023-00207: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.: (33.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): MIDLAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less