This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/25/2022 at 16:10:14 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs. VICTOR A CORTINAS

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VICTOR A CORTINAS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************2139

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

CORTINAS, VICTOR A

Fort Worth, TX 76137-5667

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Juan Carlos Goenaga

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF ATTY//FV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Retain Granted: 30 DAYS//FV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketMotion to Retain Filed: EFILED/BY PLTF ATTY /1ST REQ/HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTFS ATTY//FV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketOption Letter Mailed: FV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: DECLARATION OF NOT FOUND//NON-SERVICE // EFILED//TDH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//ME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM: EMAILED PCPUSA//ME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2022-04113: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION WITH ATTACHMENT(S)/EFILED/EMAILED TO: EFILING@PCPUSA.NET//ME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Juan Goenaga