Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/21/2021 at 08:13:28 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc. vs Vickie Wallace

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Vickie Wallace. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********66-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Midland Credit Management Inc.

a foreign limited liability company

Defendants

Wallace, Vickie

Fort Worth, TX 76119

or wherever the Defendant may be found

Fort Worth, TX 76119

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter S. Newman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-171028: Midland Credit Management Inc.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Midland Credit Management Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCitation: Picked up 4/5/2021; Wallace, Vickie: Returned Unserved 05/17/2021; Returned: 05/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where a Foreign Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Newman, Peter S