This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/21/2022 at 23:09:24 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. vs. THANH BUI

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THANH BUI. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5153

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

BUI, THANH

Grand Prairie, TX 75052

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow up/ Answer Due: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED TO PPS 01/12/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: mjscourts@abclegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCITATION: BUI, THANH: Served: 01/14/2022; Returned: 01/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED PER REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2021-09254: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: mjscourts@abclegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper