This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 11/22/2021 at 04:34:09 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs. SHELLY MOTA

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHELLY MOTA. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9920

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

MOTA, SHELLY

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Caviness

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/Option Letter Sent: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) : 01/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEmailed: OPT LETT AND COPY OF UNEXECUTED CTN TO PLTF ATTY// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketOption Letter Mailed: EMLD TO PLTF ATTY//NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: NON-SERVICE RETURN//EFILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCITATION: PCP/KAC; MOTA, SHELLY: Returned Unserved 11/01/2021; Returned: 11/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CIT AND PET TO PCP FOR SERVICE //KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2021-00955: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: efiling@pcpusa.net //KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID CAVINESS