Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/21/2021 at 04:30:23 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc. vs. Rosa E Rubio

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rosa E Rubio. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7884

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc.

Defendant

Rubio, Rosa E

Richland Hls, TX 76118-6716

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN F GILLESPIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow up/ Answer Due: (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) : 06/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service//EFILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2021-01670: Midland Credit Management Inc.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Midland Credit Management Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO ABCLEGAL//VA; Rubio, Rosa E: Served: 04/10/2021; Returned: 04/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//VA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: MidlandTX@abclegal.com//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILLESPIE JOHN F