This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/04/2022 at 22:33:57 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. vs. MOHAMMED MAQSUD

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MOHAMMED MAQSUD. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6969

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

MAQSUD, MOHAMMED

Grand Prairie, TX 75052-8366

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katharine Banks Allen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/ LOP: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEmailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: PLEASE SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1 AND 508.3 AND PROVIDE THE PROPER DOCUMENTS TO THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Affidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED ORDER TO PPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: to 106@pcpusa.net

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEmailed: RE-SEND CITATION TO Tammy Singletary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketUnrelated Case Party Contacted Court: PCP CALLED ABOUT THEIR EMAIL BEING FULL. PLEASE FORWARD THOSE THAT YOU ISSED TO Tammy Singletary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCITATION: MAQSUD, MOHAMMED: Served: 06/07/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO REQUESTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2022-04425: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s) // to efiling@pcpusa.net

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allen, Katharine Banks