This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/22/2022 at 17:15:30 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. vs. Misty Madore

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Misty Madore. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8816

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

P.O. Box 460568

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant

Madore, Misty

Euless, TX 76039-7308

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katharine Banks Allen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketComments: DEFN HAS DEFAULTED. COURT TO AWAIT PLTF'S ATTY TO REQUEST PROVE UP SETTING OR SUBMIT MOTION FOR DEFAULT/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DFNT, COURT INFORMED OF SERVICE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): BY PCP USA. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED IN PERSON ON 8/16/22 @ 10AM BY PCP USA. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2022-03016: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCITATION: Madore, Misty: Served: 08/16/2022; Returned: 08/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: TO PPS FOR SERVICE.AMW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiffs Original Petition with Attachment(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allen, Katharine Banks